NH HB1406 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-05 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/14/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-05 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/14/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the termination of Medicaid benefits when a person enters certain state institutions or county correctional facilities.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the termination of Medicaid benefits when a person enters certain state institutions or county correctional facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/14/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-04-13 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 36 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 22 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 13 |