NH HB1449 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-31 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-31 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to additional temporary supplemental allowances for retired members of the retirement system.
Title
Relative to additional temporary supplemental allowances for retired members of the retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-05-12 | House | ==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 05/17/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-04-13 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-03-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 64 |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 40 |
2016-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/29/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-02-18 | House | Work Session: 02/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-02-02 | House | Work Session: 02/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/22/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building202 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pension Plans House Journal 4 P. 15 |