NH HB1455 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of municipalities to enter into agreements for payments in lieu of taxes.
Title
Relative to the authority of municipalities to enter into agreements for payments in lieu of taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. Yvonne Thomas [D] | Rep. Marcia Hammon [D] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
Rep. William Hatch [D] | Rep. Larry Enman [D] | Rep. Leon Rideout [R] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2014-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 5 (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-01-15 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304=RECESSED= |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy |