NH HB1650 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limits in table stakes poker.
Title
Relative to limits in table stakes poker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-09-06 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2016 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-03-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 71 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 46 |
2016-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2016 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-03 | House | Work Session: 02/11/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-14 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building202 |
2016-01-14 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building202 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 22 |