NH HB233 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the right of any infant born alive to medically appropriate and reasonable care and treatment.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the right of any infant born alive to medically appropriate and reasonable care and treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 5 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-2292s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2292s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2292s, 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/30/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed DV 44-188 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 98 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 181-49 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 98 |
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 46-186 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Limit Debate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Recommit (Rep. Griffith): Motion Failed DV 40-186 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Griffith): Motion Failed DV 43-188 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Griffith): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 45-184 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 94 |
2021-02-24 | House | Special Order to next order of business (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-159 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 90 |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 31 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91322816360 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB233 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17