NH HB240 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting law enforcement agencies from using a drone to collect evidence.
Title
Prohibiting law enforcement agencies from using a drone to collect evidence.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Duarte [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Mark McLean [R] |
Rep. Joseph Lachance [R] | Rep. Daniel Tamburello [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Died on Table |
2016-01-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2016-01-20 | House | Special Order to after HB 602 (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 76 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 6 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 15 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-09-23 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-09-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-08-04 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |