NH HB324 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 201-163 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 201-163 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to campaign contributions and expenditures and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to campaign contributions and expenditures and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 163 N: 200 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 163 N: 200 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 163 N: 200 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 201-163 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 55 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 163-200 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 53 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 01/31/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 21 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 11 |