NH HB520 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain bills to have performance standard notes.
Title
Requiring certain bills to have performance standard notes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.57 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.384 | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/25/11; Senate Calendar 25 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Hearing: 5/5/11, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 14, Pg.272 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.729 | |
2011-03-01 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.536 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-02-22 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/24/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Legislative Administration |