NH HB520 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to availability of diaper changing stations in public restrooms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to availability of diaper changing stations in public restrooms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 142 NV: 13 Abs: 39) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-02SenateHearing: 04/10/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0952h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-142 03/19/2019
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0952h: Amendment Adopted DV 196-139 03/19/2019
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0952h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 19
2019-03-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback