NH HB520 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 57; Eff: 07/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 57; Eff: 07/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to e-delivery of insurance documents and commercial lines renewal notices.
Title
Relative to e-delivery of insurance documents and commercial lines renewal notices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 57; Eff: 07/24/2021 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/13/2021); Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 104 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 6 |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 5 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452 |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 52 |