NH HB552 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 293; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 293; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transparency and standards for acquisition transactions in health care.
Title
Relative to transparency and standards for acquisition transactions in health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 148 NV: 21 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 293; Eff: 01/01/2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2557e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2557e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2335s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 10 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2335s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2335s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2335s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Hearing: 05/21/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0475h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-148 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 47 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0475h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 47 |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0475h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-31 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 19 |