NH HB578 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the position of reporting administrator in the department of education.
Title
Establishing the position of reporting administrator in the department of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 578-FN 02/01/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 5 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 21 |