NH HB581 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Executive Session: 10/11/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Executive Session: 10/11/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring schools to continue the education of a child during the child's suspension or expulsion.
Title
Requiring schools to continue the education of a child during the child's suspension or expulsion.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | House | Executive Session: 10/11/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-06 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 34 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 6 |
2015-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-08-13 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-26 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 230 |