NH HB609 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 27; Eff: 07/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 27; Eff: 07/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to innovation schools.
Title
Relative to innovation schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - OTP (Y: 192 N: 156 NV: 10 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTP (Y: 192 N: 156 NV: 15 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - OTP (Y: 192 N: 156 NV: 10 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTP (Y: 192 N: 156 NV: 15 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 27; Eff: 07/05/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/22/2021); Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 101 |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1125e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 100 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1125e Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/08/2021; Senate Calendar 18 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-25 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Ladd): Motion Failed DV 147-198 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 32 |
2021-02-25 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-156 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 30 |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 28 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 56 |