NH SB181 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB181
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Pending Motion Interim Study; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Pending Motion Interim Study; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring monitoring of certain radioactive air pollutants.
Title
Requiring monitoring of certain radioactive air pollutants.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Peter Somssich [D] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Patricia Bushway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Pending Motion Interim Study; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB181 (Carry Over) 2019-12-04 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study