NH SB214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 275; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to transportation projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transportation projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 275; Effective 09/17/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1979h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 17
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1979h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 17
2019-05-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1979h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 6
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 05/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-11SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:35 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback