NH SB240 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB240
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the monitoring and treatment of contaminated wells.
Title
Relative to the monitoring and treatment of contaminated wells.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305 |
2018-09-05 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-05-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 05/02/2018 (Vote 16-3-; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 23 |
2018-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-04-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/27/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0154s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0154s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0154s, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Reconsideration on the vote of Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer, Regular Calendar 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 240-FN-L to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 240-FN-L to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0807s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-0807s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0807s, 03/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/15/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB240 (Carry Over) 2017-10-04 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study