NH SB91 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB91
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the title loan default process.
Title
Relative to the title loan default process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB91 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11