NJ A2572 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1942
Note: Carry Foward to future A3998
Note: Carry Over of previous A3289
Note: Carry Over of previous S1144
Note: Carry Foward to future A3998
Note: Carry Over of previous A3289
Note: Carry Over of previous S1144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices at certain pharmacies and certain businesses with on site pharmacies.
Title
Prohibits sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices at certain pharmacies and certain businesses with on site pharmacies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2572 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2572 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S305 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3289 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1144 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2572 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S305 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3289 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1144 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2572 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2572_I1.HTM |