NJ A4803 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns approval process for personal protective equipment and State stockpiles of personal protective equipment.
Title
Concerns approval process for personal protective equipment and State stockpiles of personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2991 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2991 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2991/3117 (SCS) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3117 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Combined with S2991 (SCS)
S2991 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4803/4811 (ACS/1R)
S2991 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4803/4811 (ACS/1R)