NY A00993 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to use of accrued sick time, compensation time or vacation time.
Title
Relates to use of accrued sick time, compensation time or vacation time.
Sponsors
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.901 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03726 (Same As) 2018-11-02 - PRINT NUMBER 3726A