NY A01986 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax exemption on real property owned by active auxiliary police officers in local law enforcement agencies in certain counties having a population of more than three hundred twenty thousand and less than three hundred fifty thousand, determined in accordance with the latest federal decennial census.
Title
Provides a tax exemption on real property owned by active auxiliary police officers in local law enforcement agencies in certain counties having a population of more than three hundred twenty thousand and less than three hundred fifty thousand, determined in accordance with the latest federal decennial census.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | print number 1986a |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03967 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - referred to real property taxation