NY S03967 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax exemption on real property owned by active auxiliary police officers in local law enforcement agencies in certain counties having a population of more than three hundred twenty thousand and less than three hundred fifty thousand, determined in accordance with the latest federal decennial census.
Title
Provides a tax exemption on real property owned by active auxiliary police officers in local law enforcement agencies in certain counties having a population of more than three hundred twenty thousand and less than three hundred fifty thousand, determined in accordance with the latest federal decennial census.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.357 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3967A |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.444 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01986 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation