NY A02476 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - print number 2476a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to mandating greater levels of disclosure by non-fiduciaries that provide investment advice; requires signed acknowledgement of disclosure informing clients that the advisor owes no fiduciary duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to mandating greater levels of disclosure by non-fiduciaries that provide investment advice; requires signed acknowledgement of disclosure informing clients that the advisor owes no fiduciary duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblyprint number 2476a
2019-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S02872 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - PRINT NUMBER 2872A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback