NY A02885 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that functional epinephrine auto-injector devices be made available in places of public assembly and that at least one employee or volunteer of such place of public assembly be trained in its proper operation and use and be present at each facility function.
Title
Requires that functional epinephrine auto-injector devices be made available in places of public assembly and that at least one employee or volunteer of such place of public assembly be trained in its proper operation and use and be present at each facility function.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Demond Meeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.343 |
2024-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-07-10 | Assembly | print number 2885a |
2023-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01078 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE