NY A03326 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification requirements for a seven day license to sell liquor at retail for consumption off the premises.
Title
Relates to notification requirements for a seven day license to sell liquor at retail for consumption off the premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2019-06-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | recommitted to economic development |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substitution reconsidered |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.113 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a3326a |
2019-03-19 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1130A |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.67 |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.136 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | restored to third reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substitution reconsidered |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s1130a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.113 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.113 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | print number 3326a |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S01130 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07052 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S07052 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS