NY A04913 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a personal income tax check-off box for donations to the school-based health centers fund; creates the school-based health centers fund; specifies the use for which moneys of the fund may be expended.
Title
Creates a personal income tax check-off box for donations to the school-based health centers fund; creates the school-based health centers fund; specifies the use for which moneys of the fund may be expended.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] |
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Keith Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4913a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.193 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.608 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.608 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00971 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 971A