NY A05297 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8932
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8932
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the amount of a property tax shift from one class of property to another for 2018-2019 in the county of Suffolk.
Title
Limits the amount of a property tax shift from one class of property to another for 2018-2019 in the county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8932 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.241 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.241 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | print number 5297a |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | committed to real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.378 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.285 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |