NY A06168 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the appointment of a transit dependent and para-transit dependent representative on the Niagara Frontier transportation authority.
Title
Requires the appointment of a transit dependent and para-transit dependent representative on the Niagara Frontier transportation authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Patrick Burke [D] |
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 6168b |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | print number 6168a |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03656 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES