NY A10641 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Islip, county of Suffolk.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Islip, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s8103 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.471 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | print number 10641a |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2016-06-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |