NY S01974 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1974D
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1974D
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.
Title
Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1974D |
2012-11-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2012-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1974C |
2012-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2012-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1974B |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1974A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2011-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01712 (Same As) 2012-12-05 - print number 1712d