NY S02773 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 2773A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 2773A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires animal shelters that receive state funding to annually report on intake and disposition of animals; such reports shall be available to the public.
Title
Requires animal shelters that receive state funding to annually report on intake and disposition of animals; such reports shall be available to the public.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2773A |
2016-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2015-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A02846 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - print number 2846a