NY S03246 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits persons with licenses to sell beer or wine products for consumption off premises to provide beer samples in their licensed establishments.
Title
Permits persons with licenses to sell beer or wine products for consumption off premises to provide beer samples in their licensed establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | referred to codes | |
2010-06-15 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-15 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-15 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.962 | |
2010-06-14 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-05-11 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-27 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-01-19 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-05-12 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-21 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-03-13 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A7151 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - reported referred to rules