NY S03297 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state comprehensive information system act"; authorizes the state library to coordinate the purchase of electronic databases or other information resources for state agencies, library systems and other governmental entities.
Title
Enacts the "New York state comprehensive information system act"; authorizes the state library to coordinate the purchase of electronic databases or other information resources for state agencies, library systems and other governmental entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2012-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-30 | Senate | AMENDED 3297A |
2012-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.124 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2011-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.366 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04997 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - print number 4997a