NY S04609 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization for imposition of additional sales and compensating use tax in Columbia county until 2017.
Title
Extends the authorization for imposition of additional sales and compensating use tax in Columbia county until 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.307 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.656 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a6782 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.790 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06782 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4609