NY S06022 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5278B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5278B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to discharged LGBT veterans; adds veterans who have qualifying conditions or who are discharged as LGBT veterans to certain provisions that apply to veterans who have been honorably discharged or released from military service.
Title
Relates to discharged LGBT veterans; adds veterans who have qualifying conditions or who are discharged as LGBT veterans to certain provisions that apply to veterans who have been honorably discharged or released from military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5278B |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1852 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6022B |
2022-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6022A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05278 (Same As) 2022-11-10 - signed chap.585