NY S06577 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims and actions against the New York city school construction authority arising out of contracts.
Title
Relates to claims and actions against the New York city school construction authority arising out of contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.519 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.281 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a8805 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.606 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08805 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - substituted by s6577