NY S08338 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.350
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey certain unused state lands to MCB-Eagle New Paltz, LLC upon the consent of the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation, in consideration of fair market value and upon such other terms and conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey certain unused state lands to MCB-Eagle New Paltz, LLC upon the consent of the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation, in consideration of fair market value and upon such other terms and conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.350
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.387
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11005
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1607
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-02SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A11005 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8338

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback