OK SB780 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Oklahoma Home Service Contract Act. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Oklahoma Home Service Contract Act. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-25 | HAs read | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-20 | General Order | |
2011-04-18 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6753 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6754 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |