OK SB789 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Specialty equipment; creating Fair Practices of Equipment Manufacturers, Distributors, Wholesalers and Dealers Act. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Specialty equipment; creating Fair Practices of Equipment Manufacturers, Distributors, Wholesalers and Dealers Act. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - House: , THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-21 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6 | |
2011-04-21 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | Remove Representative Sanders as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jackson | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-16 | Title restored | |
2011-03-16 | Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Brecheen | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 245A | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 245A | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 245A | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 245A | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 245A | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1000 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |