PA SB654 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income; and establishing the Public Transportation Trust Fund.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income; and establishing the Public Transportation Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Tracy Pennycuick [R] |
Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House Floor: SB 654 PN 1433, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03667 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03627 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: To Strike Amendment (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 654 PN 698, 2023 A3309 (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 654 PN 698, Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03667 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03627 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: To Strike Amendment (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 654 PN 698, 2023 A3309 (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 654 PN 698, Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2024-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (106-95) |
2024-03-19 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2024-03-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-03-18 | House | Validity of Committee Report Sustained (102-99) |
2024-03-18 | House | Motion to Object to Committee Report |
2024-03-18 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2023-12-13 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-12-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-12-12 | House | Removed from table |
2023-12-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-12-12 | House | First consideration |
2023-12-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-09-21 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2023-09-19 | House | In the House |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-2) |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |