SD HB1057 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 761 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 597 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 560 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 569 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 542 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 392 |
2013-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 359 |
2013-02-07 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 337 |
2013-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to House Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 228 |
2013-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 31 |