SD HB1127 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify requirements for incorporating municipalities that are within three miles of another incorporated municipality.
Title
Modify requirements for incorporating municipalities that are within three miles of another incorporated municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 H.J. 364 |
2024-02-15 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 15, 2024 H.J. 340 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 330 |
2024-02-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 322 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 11. S.J. 300 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 286 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 237 |
2024-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 218 |
2024-01-30 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2024-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 144 |