TX SB1911 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to election supplies and the conduct of elections; creating criminal offenses; increasing criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to election supplies and the conduct of elections; creating criminal offenses; increasing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to Elections |
2023-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |