US HB1783 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Food Modernization Act - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to issue loan guarantees to local educational agencies (LEAs) participating in the school lunch program, tribal organizations, or consortia of such entities to finance the construction, remodeling, or expansion of infrastructure or the purchase of durable equipment that will facilitate their provision of healthy meals through the school breakfast and lunch programs. Requires the Secretary to give a preference to applicants that, compared with other applicants, demonstrate a substantial or disproportionate need for food service infrastructure or durable equipment. Prohibits a loan guarantee from covering more than 90% of a loan's principal. Amends the Child Nutrition Act of 1966 to direct the Secretary to award competitive grants to assist LEAs participating in the school lunch program, tribal organizations, or consortia of such entities in purchasing the durable equipment and infrastructure they need to serve healthier meals and improve food safety. Gives grant priority to applicants that serve a high percentage of students eligible for free or reduced price meals under the school lunch program. Directs the Secretary to award competitive matching grants to experienced third-party training institutions to provide school food service personnel with the training and technical assistance they need to meet updated school lunch program nutrition standards.
Title
School Food Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Joe Garcia [D-FL] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Gloria Negrete McLeod [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2210 (Related) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Education
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government lending and loan guarantees
Nutrition and diet
Poverty and welfare assistance
School administration
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government lending and loan guarantees
Nutrition and diet
Poverty and welfare assistance
School administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1783/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1783/BILLS-113hr1783ih.pdf |