US HB2486 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

FUTURE Act Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act This bill requires the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to disclose certain tax return information to the Department of Education (ED) for the purpose of administering financial aid and loan programs. Upon receiving a request from ED, the IRS must disclose specified tax return information to ED for the purposes of establishing enrollment, renewing enrollment, administering, and conducting analyses and forecasts for estimating costs related to income-contingent or income-based repayment programs; discharging loans based on a total and permanent disability; determining the eligibility for, and the amount of, federal student financial aid; and conducting analyses and forecasts for estimating costs related to federal student financial aid programs. ED may only use the disclosed information for the purposes above and for mitigating risks related to the programs. Mitigation of risks includes conducting oversight and reducing improper payments. It does not include conducting criminal investigations or prosecutions. With the consent of the taxpayer, ED may disclose the return information to certain institutions of higher education, state higher education agencies, and scholarship organizations solely for the use in financial aid programs. The bill specifies notification and reporting requirements related to the disclosures and the implementation of the bill. The bill also permanently extends funding for minority-serving institutions of higher education and increases funding for Pell Grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FUTURE Act Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
2020-07-22SenateMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-07-22SenateOn motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(b) of H. Res. 891 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 184 (Roll no. 154). (text: CR H3638-3639)
2020-07-22SenateOn motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(a) of H. Res. 891 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 183 (Roll no. 153). (text: CR H3625-3628)
2020-07-22SenatePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - 1At the conclusion of debate on the Jayapal motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(b) of H. Res. 891, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Nadler demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced.
2020-07-22SenateThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-07-22SenatePursuant to H. Res. 891, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on the motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(b). (consideration: CR H3638-3642, H3666-3667)
2020-07-22SenatePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jayapal motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(a) of H. Res. 891, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Nadler demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced.
2020-07-22SenateThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-07-22SenateDEBATE - The House resumed debate on the House amendment to the Senate amendment.
2020-07-22SenateDEBATE - Pursuant H. Res. 891, the question shall be divided among the two House amendments. Pursuant to section 3(a) of H. Res. 891, the portion of the divided question comprising of the amendment specified in section 4(a) of H. Res. 891 shall be considered first. Each amendment specified in section 4 shall be debatable for one hour.
2020-07-22SenatePursuant to H. Res. 891, Ms. Jayapal was recognized to move that the House concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486 with amendments specified in section 4 of H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H3625-3638, H3666)
2020-03-10SenateRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, H.R. 2486 and H.R. 6172. Resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, and H.R. 6172. For S.J. Res. 68, the resolution provides for 1 hour of debate and 1 motion to commit. For the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, the question will be divided and each portion will have 1 hour of debate. H.R. 6172 will have 1 hour ofdebate and 1 motion to recommit with or without instructions.
2019-12-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-05SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
2019-12-05SenateS.Amdt.1255 Amendment SA 1255 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-05SenateS.Amdt.1255 Amendment SA 1255 proposed by Senator Scott SC for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6865; text: CR S6894-6895) In the nature of a substitute.
2019-12-05SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6865)
2019-09-23SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 212.
2019-09-19SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2019-09-18SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-09-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7734-7735)
2019-09-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2486.
2019-09-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7734-7737)
2019-09-17HouseMs. Adams moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1279 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5363 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 116-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB640 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1346 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR891 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4674 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22.
HB2214 (Related) 2020-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 333.
HB3991 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
HB4398 (Related) 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB5133 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Ordered to be Reported.
HB5581 (Related) 2020-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback