US HB2583 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to expand and expedite access to cardiac rehabilitation programs and pulmonary rehabilitation programs under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.
Title
Increasing Access to Quality Cardiac Rehabilitation Care Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Jonathan Jackson [D-IL] |
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Becca Balint [D-VT] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2713 (Related) 2023-04-19 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2418 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3481 (Related) 2023-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2418 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3481 (Related) 2023-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2583/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2583/BILLS-118hr2583ih.pdf |