US HB3115 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Living Shorelines Act of 2019 This bill directs the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to award grants to state or local governments, Indian tribes, or nonprofit organizations to (1) implement climate-resilient living shoreline projects; and (2) encourage innovation in the use of natural materials to protect coastal communities, habitats, and natural system functions. In awarding grants, NOAA must prioritize projects in areas (1) where a federal disaster has been declared in the past 10 years, or (2) that have a history of coastal erosion or frequent coastal inundation in the past 10 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Living Shorelines Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
2019-11-26HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-316.
2019-09-25HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
2019-09-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-25HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-07-25HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-06-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1730 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback