US HB5018 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Reserve Accountability and Transparency Act of 2014 - Amends the Federal Reserve Act (FRA) to direct the Chairman of the Federal Open Market Committee (FOMC) to submit to the Comptroller General (GAO) and to certain congressional committees a Directive Policy Rule (DPR), including an identification of FOMC members who voted in its favor. Defines DPR as a policy rule developed by the FOMC that meets specified requirements and provides the basis for the Open Market Operations Directive. Directs GAO to study whether the DPR has materially changed, audit any materially changed DPR, and report to certain congressional committees on whether the ensuing DPR and the FOMC are in compliance with this Act. Requires the Chairman of the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System (Federal Reserve Board) to testify before certain congressional committees as to why non-compliance with this Act, if any, exists. Establishes a one-week blackout period during which permissible public communications by FOMC members and staff are restricted with respect to: (1) macroeconomic or financial developments; or (2) current, or prospective monetary policy issues. Amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act (Dodd-Frank) to direct the Federal Reserve Board to issue regulations, after public notice and comment, that provide for the at least three different sets of conditions (baseline, adverse, and severely adverse) and related methodologies required under current law for the evaluation of nonbank financial companies and certain bank holding companies with over $50 billion in assets. Directs the Federal Reserve Board to disclose publicly the aggregate number of supervisory letters sent to such bank holding companies, including the aggregate number of such letters designated as either "Matters Requiring Attention" or "Matters Requiring Immediate Attention." Increases from semi-annual to quarterly the number of times the Chairman of the Federal Reserve Board is required to give testimony to Congress. Amends the FRA to require the Vice Chairman for Supervision to give written testimony on the status of all pending and anticipated rulemakings made by the Board. Requires the Federal Reserve Board, before issuing any regulation, to assess the costs and benefits of available regulatory alternatives and choose the approach that maximizes net benefits and is tailored to impose the least impact on the availability of credit, economic growth, and the least burden on society. Prescribes the contents of a post-adoption impact assessment plan the Board must develop whenever it adopts or amends a major rule. Amends the FRA to prescribe ethics standards governing Federal Reserve Board members and employees, including requirements for disclosure of staff salaries and financial information. Prescribes requirements for Federal Reserve Board negotiations with any foreign or multinational entity. Amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to prescribe requirements for negotiations by the Board of Directors of the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC) with any foreign or multinational entity. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, as a prerequisite to entering into negotiations with any foreign or multinational entity, to notify and consult with certain congressional committees regarding the nature of the agreement and its anticipated effects upon the economy.
Title
Federal Reserve Accountability and Transparency Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] |
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] |
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] | Rep. Marlin Stutzman [R-IN] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-10 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2014-07-07 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2014-07-07 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2014-07-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1062 (Related) 2013-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3928 (Related) 2014-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB3928 (Related) 2014-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international banking
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Inflation and prices
Interest, dividends, interest rates
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Monetary policy
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international banking
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Inflation and prices
Interest, dividends, interest rates
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Monetary policy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5018/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5018/BILLS-113hr5018ih.pdf |