US SB3777 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Forever GI Bill Housing Payment Fulfillment Act of 2018
Title
Forever GI Bill Housing Payment Fulfillment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 466 (Y: 389 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 466). (text: CR H10428-10429) |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10442-10443) |
2018-12-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3777. |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10428-10430) |
2018-12-20 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7821-7822; text: CR S7821-7822) |